Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|