House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0854
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|