Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Postponed - Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 021-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|