House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|