House | 04/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |