House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0708
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|