House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|