Senate
|
12/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/20/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|