House | 05/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Police & Fire Committee; by Voice Vote | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |