Senate | 11/14/2024 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 11/14/2024 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-034-002 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 006-003-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Restorative Justice | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |