House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0744
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 046-009-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 010-003-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Re-referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|