House | 04/19/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Stephens |