Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|