House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0864
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 049-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|