House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0719
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|