House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |