House | 12/04/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 11/21/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 11/20/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 11/19/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |