House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver |