Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|