House
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0613
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 022-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|