House | 04/12/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Beth Canty |