House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |