House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |