House
|
05/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 015-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|