House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |