House | 05/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |