House | 11/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |