House | 11/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 11/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 11/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez | ||
House | 11/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 10/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 10/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 09/11/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |