House
|
12/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
11/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|