Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Adopted Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|