Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HR0341 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/31/2023

                            HR0341LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r   HR0341  LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r
  HR0341  LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r
1  HOUSE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of
3  Representatives wish to congratulate MajorBelle (Brown) James
4  on the occasion of her 100th birthday on May 17, 2023; and
5  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James was born to Dock and Rosa Brown
6  in Belzoni, Mississippi on May 17, 1923; she was the only
7  daughter of five siblings, including Hosea, William, Earl, and
8  Alfred; and
9  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James attended Forestville and Willard
10  grammar schools, and she graduated 8th grade from Willard; she
11  graduated from DuSable High School in 1941; and
12  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James married John Velry James on May
13  3, 1943; they had one child, Rochelle James, who was born on
14  October 31, 1943; they enjoyed 49 years of marriage until his
15  passing on August 30, 1992; and
16  WHEREAS, For 41 years, MajorBelle James was employed at
17  Curtis Candy, known today as Nabisco, from 1947 until she
18  retired in 1988; and
19  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James attended and was baptized at
20  both Ebenezer Missionary Baptist Church and Corpus Christi

 

  HR0341  LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r


HR0341- 2 -LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r   HR0341 - 2 - LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r
  HR0341 - 2 - LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r
1  Catholic Church, becoming a member of Corpus Christi Catholic
2  Church at 15 years old; she formerly attended St. Ambrose
3  Catholic Church and now attends St. Josephine Bakhita Parish;
4  she was a member of The Knights of Peter Claver Ladies
5  Auxiliary; and
6  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James has enjoyed cooking, especially
7  baking cakes, and dancing; her hobbies have included
8  videography, photography, and astrology; and
9  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James is the aunt of well-known singer
10  Donny Hathaway, the son of her oldest brother, Hosea; and
11  WHEREAS, MajorBelle James is the grandmother of four, with
12  one preceding her in death; the great-grandmother of 10, with
13  one preceding her in death; the great-great-grandmother of 10;
14  and the great-great-great grandmother of one; therefore, be it
15  RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE
16  HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that
17  we congratulate MajorBelle (Brown) James on celebrating her
18  100th birthday; and be it further
19  RESOLVED, That a suitable copy of this resolution be
20  presented to MajorBelle James as an expression of our esteem
21  and respect.

 

 

  HR0341 - 2 - LRB103 32650 LAW 62348 r