House
|
04/10/2024
|
Resolution Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|