LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR0552
Action History
IL
Illinois House Bill HR0552
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois House Bill HR0552
Action History
House
05/23/2024
Resolution Adopted
House
05/02/2024
Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
House
05/02/2024
Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
House
03/12/2024
Assigned to Public Health Committee
House
01/16/2024
Referred to Rules Committee
House
01/12/2024
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons