House | 05/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 05/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick | ||
House | 05/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 05/25/2024 | Resolution Adopted | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Swanson |