Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HR0916 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/23/2024

                            HR0916LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r   HR0916  LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
  HR0916  LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
1  HOUSE RESOLUTION
2  WHEREAS, The members of the Illinois House of
3  Representatives are saddened to learn of the death of Jann
4  Alberta Mae Beauchamp, who passed away on October 18, 2024;
5  and
6  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was born to Albert Alexander and
7  Cornelia Mae Cox in Chicago on December 7, 1931; she graduated
8  from Grant Elementary School in Chicago and her family moved
9  to Maywood in 1945; she graduated from Proviso Township High
10  School in 1949 and attended the University of Illinois at Navy
11  Pier; she married James A. Beauchamp on October 16, 1954; and
12  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was devoted to her faith; she
13  joined Canaan AME Church in Maywood and was baptized in
14  December 1946; her family joined St. John Evangelical Lutheran
15  Church in Forest Park in 1969, where she was a member for 55
16  years and served in various roles; and
17  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp returned to college as a wife and
18  mother; she received her associate degree from Triton College
19  and her Bachelor of Arts from Rosary College, known today as
20  Dominican University; after earning her Master of Business
21  Administration from Rosary College, she used her training and
22  skill set to give back to the community; she worked at

 

  HR0916  LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r


HR0916- 2 -LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r   HR0916 - 2 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
  HR0916 - 2 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
1  Dominican University in River Forest as an administrative
2  assistant to its presidents, Sister Candida Lund and Sister
3  Jean Murray, from June 1972 to August 1983; she then served as
4  an adjunct faculty member at Triton College from 1985 until
5  2002; at the Triton Resource Center, she helped train students
6  as registered nurses and court reporters and in other
7  disciplines; and
8  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was elected to the Proviso Family
9  Service and Mental Health Board in Melrose Park, where she
10  served from 1977 to 1998; she was appointed as an alternate
11  board member by St. John Lutheran Church, and she served on the
12  board of directors of Walther Lutheran High School in Melrose
13  Park from 1977 to 1981; she won her first general election as a
14  school board member of Proviso Township High School District
15  209 in 1991; that same year, she was elected as a trustee for
16  the Village of Bellwood, where she served from 1995 to 2003;
17  and
18  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was a forerunner and a
19  trailblazer; she was charter member of the National Museum of
20  African American History and Culture in Washington, D.C. in
21  2012; and
22  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was the recipient of numerous
23  accolades, acknowledgments, and awards, including receiving

 

 

  HR0916 - 2 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r


HR0916- 3 -LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r   HR0916 - 3 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
  HR0916 - 3 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
1  the Marquis Who's Who in America Award as an educator and
2  information scientist twice in her 90s; she was also
3  recognized and honored in many local and national newspapers,
4  journals, and books; and
5  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was an avid golfer and reader, and
6  she was a patron of the fine arts and performing arts; she
7  retained her drive for knowledge in her later years through
8  taking community classes, attending performances, and
9  researching her family genealogy; and
10  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp was preceded in death by her
11  husband of 44 years, James; her parents; and her siblings,
12  Melville Carr, Laura Jackson, Charlotte Wheeler, Alice McNeal,
13  Elaine Sampson, and Albert Cox Jr.; and
14  WHEREAS, Jann Beauchamp is survived by her children, David
15  Beauchamp, Carol Beauchamp Randolph, and Elaine
16  Beauchamp-Prospers; her grandchildren, Calvin Randolph Jr.,
17  Cristen (Dirk) Blanchard, Alan Beauchamp, Mallory Beauchamp,
18  Corey Harris, Amador (Juliet) Porras, Courtney Harris,
19  Isabella Porras, and Zoe Porras; and her great-grandchildren,
20  Dexter Harris, Zepplin Porras, and Demi Harris; therefore, be
21  it
22  RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE

 

 

  HR0916 - 3 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r


HR0916- 4 -LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r   HR0916 - 4 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
  HR0916 - 4 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r
1  HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, that
2  we mourn the passing of Jann Alberta Mae Beauchamp and extend
3  our sincere condolences to her family, friends, and all who
4  knew and loved her; and be it further

 

 

  HR0916 - 4 - LRB103 43074 MST 76328 r