Senate | 06/12/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | To Subcommittee on Firearms | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |