Senate | 06/26/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Local Government | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |