Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0058
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|