Senate | 05/03/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |