Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 033-020-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Senate Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|