Senate | 03/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |