House | 03/06/2024 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Arrived in House | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |