Senate | 04/17/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Postponed - Executive | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |