Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|