Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0062
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date June 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-024-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 051-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Agriculture; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|