Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Public Health | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant |