Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass Labor; 010-004-000 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Labor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin |