Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Item/Reduction Veto Stands 103-0006
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Reduction Veto October 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Governor Item/Reduction Veto PA 103-0006; With Appropriation Items Reduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date July 1, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Effective Date June 7, 2023; Some Provisions
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 070-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 034-022-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Approved For Consideration Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (d-10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Appropriations; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|