Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
To Subcommittee on Gaming, Wagering, and Racing
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|