Senate | 02/05/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |